This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 10:59:22 (UTC).

SIMMONS BANK vs. INNOVATIVE PATHOLOGY LABORATORY SERVICES, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 SIMMONS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INNOVATIVE PATHOLOGY LABORATORY SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7431

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS BANK

Defendants

INNOVATIVE PATHOLOGY LABORATORY SERVICES, LLC

1811 Bering Drive Ste 420

Houston, TX 77057

WILLIAMS, JENNIFER

Houston, TX 77068

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, BRIAN THOMPSON

Defendant Attorney

COLEMAN, THOMAS F

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT 10/06/22 8:00 MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: 10/06/22 8:00 MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Summary Judgment; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: SET BY TJ HAMILTON 214-745-5279,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: 10/06/22 8:00 MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: JENNIFER WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: INNOVATIVE PATHOLOGY LABORATORY SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 40830-2022-DCLK; SIMMONS BANK $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SIMMONS BANK ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant