This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 04:08:35 (UTC).

SIMMONS BANK vs. IDALIA HINTON

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 SIMMONS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IDALIA HINTON. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2687

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS BANK

Defendant

HINTON, IDALIA

Garland, TX 75044-7065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERER, GEORGE COLBY

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

192 DWOPNO ACTION Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Judgment Type; DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; HINTON, IDALIA; Awarded Against:; SIMMONS BANK

FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Judgment Type: DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; HINTON, IDALIA: Awarded Against:; SIMMONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 17063-2022-DCLK; SIMMONS BANK $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 14754-2022-DCLK; SIMMONS BANK $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIMMONS BANK : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SIMMONS BANK ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George C. Scherer