This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 10:05:07 (UTC).

SHANNON MICHELLE VOICE vs. REBECCA ROCHELLE MCKOWN, MDet al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 SHANNON MICHELLE VOICE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against REBECCA ROCHELLE MCKOWN, MD. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1437

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOICE, SHANNON MICHELLE

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendants

TON, RACHEL, MD

Greenfield, IN 46140

ALEX, MAYA S., MD

Paso, TX 79902

METHODIST HOSPITALS OF DALLAS

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

KESSLER WOMEN'S HEALTHCARE, P.A.

By Serving Its Registered Agent Patricia Larue 1330 N Beckley Ave Ste 101

Dallas, TX 75203

MCKOWN, REBECCA ROCHELLE, MD

Dallas, TX 75208

THE METHODIST DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER GOLDEN CROSS ACADEMIC CLINIC

METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAN, SORANA G.

KASTL, KRISTINA N.

HOLLINGSWORTH, BLAKE T

Defendant Attorneys

KING, JENNIFER A

RYAN, JEFFREY W

 

Court Documents

Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3

PROPOSED ORDER OBJECTION MOTION TO DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

MOTION - CONTINUANCE

GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

OBJECTION TO EXPERT REPORT AND MOTION TO DISMISS

OBJECTION; Comment: OBJECTION TO EXPERT REPORT AND MOTION TO DISMISS

FP FILE DESK JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS - RACHEL TON, MD

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

ISSUE CITATION - METHODIST HOSPITALS OF DALLAS D/B/A METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM ET AL

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - METHODIST HOSPITALS OF DALLAS D/B/A METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - REBECCA ROCHELLE MCKOWN, MD

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - KESSLER WOMEN'S HEALTHCARE, P.A.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - MAYA S. ALEX, MD

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Comment: OBJECTION/MOTION TO DISMISS, NASTACIA THOMPSOM 214-740-3103 BY PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S CHAPTER 74 EXPERT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORT AND MOTION TO DISMISS, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CURE EXPERT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/10/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 02/10/2021: Comment; METHODIST HOSPITALS OF DALLAS D/B/A METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM D/B/A THE METHODIST DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER GOLDEN CROSS ACADEMIC CLINIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Served: 02/10/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 02/25/2021: Comment; RACHEL TON, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VOICE, SHANNON MICHELLE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 7167-2021-DCLK; VOICE, SHANNON MICHELLE $384.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VOICE, SHANNON MICHELLE : Transaction Assessment; ; $384.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: VOICE, SHANNON MICHELLE ; Total Financial Assessment $384.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $384.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METHODIST DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where METHODIST HOSPITALS OF DALLAS is a litigant

Latest cases where Methodist Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, JENNIFER A