This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/07/2022 at 21:10:10 (UTC).

SANDRA DENISE JACKSON vs. SILVERIO GONZALEZ, DIAMOND EXPRESS INC., DIAMOND TRUCKING INC.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 SANDRA DENISE JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SILVERIO GONZALEZ, DIAMOND EXPRESS INC , DIAMOND TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********62-C

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON, SANDRA DENISE

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendants

GONZALEZ, SILVERIO

Laredo, TX 78046

DIAMOND EXPRESS INC.

1911 Durango Avenue

Laredo, TX 78046

DIAMOND TRUCKING INC.

1911 Durango Avenue

Laredo, TX 78046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORENO, KAITLYN N

Defendant Attorney

LAIDLAW, DONALD

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO COURT RE: ISSUING CITATION

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER TO COURT RE: ISSUING CITATION

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 61839626

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 61839626

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 61839626

NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS

PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING RECORD AFFIDAVITS AND CERTIFIED COPIES

NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING RECORD AFFIDAVITS AND CERTIFIED COPIES

SILVERION GONZALEZ

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SILVERION GONZALEZ

SERVICE DIAMOND TRUCKING INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE DIAMOND TRUCKING INC.

SERVICE DIAMOND EXPRESS INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVICE DIAMOND EXPRESS INC.

DEFENDANT SILVERIO GONZALEZ ORIGINAL ANSWER AND RULE 193.7

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORGIGINAL ANSWER AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORIGINAL ANSWER AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 62218596; (RESENT UNDER ENV# 62216520, T.W.)

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 62218596; (RESENT UNDER ENV# 62216520, T.W.)

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 62218596; (RESENT UNDER ENV# 62216520, T.W.)

LETTER TO COURT RE: ISSUING CITATION

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER TO COURT RE: ISSUING CITATION

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING RECORD AFFIDAVITS AND CERTIFIED COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SILVERION GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: DIAMOND TRUCKING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: DIAMOND EXPRESS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 04/08/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/19/2022: Served; 04/06/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Returned: 05/19/2022; Served: 04/06/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JACKSON, SANDRA DENISE : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JACKSON, SANDRA DENISE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-01395; JACKSON, SANDRA DENISE $237.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JACKSON, SANDRA DENISE : Transaction Assessment; ; $374.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: JACKSON, SANDRA DENISE ; Total Financial Assessment $374.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $374.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 62218596; (RESENT UNDER ENV# 62216520, T.W.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER TO COURT RE: ISSUING CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAMOND EXPRESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Diamond S. Trucking is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAIDLAW, DONALD