This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/23/2022 at 05:06:08 (UTC).

SAMUEL HERRERA, et al vs. FABIAN CAPETILLO

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 SAMUEL HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FABIAN CAPETILLO. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8426

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERRERA, SAMUEL

Tyler, TX 75702

HERRERA, RACHEL

Defendant

CAPETILLO, FABIAN

Dallas, TX 75251

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COWDEN, GEORGE, IV

Defendant Attorney

CAREY, J KEVIN

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

PLAINITFF 1ST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PLAINITFF 1ST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINITFF 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PLAINITFF 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: JURY

DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER/JURY DEMAND-FABIAN OSCAR GARCIA CAPETILLO

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - FABIAN OSCAR GARCIA CAPETILLO

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - FABIAN OSCAR GARCIA CAPETILLO

ORDER SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO FABIAN CAPETILLO

ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: AS TO FABIAN CAPETILLO

PLAINTIFF CERTIFIED CRASH REPORT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PLAINTIFF CERTIFIED CRASH REPORT

PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO FABIAN CAPETILLO

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

PLAINITFF MTN SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTUTE SERVICE AS TO FABIAN OSCAR GARCIA CAPETILLO

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTUTE SERVICE AS TO FABIAN OSCAR GARCIA CAPETILLO

PLAINITFF MTN SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO FABIAN OSCAR GARCIA CAPETILLO

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PLAINITFF 1ST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PLAINITFF 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAPETILLO, FABIAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 22161-2022-DCLK; CAPETILLO, FABIAN $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAPETILLO, FABIAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: CAPETILLO, FABIAN ; Total Financial Assessment $10.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND; Comment: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: M/SUBST SERVICE EXHIBIT 1 IS BLANK - SEND EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTUTE SERVICE AS TO FABIAN OSCAR GARCIA CAPETILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/09/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 03/18/2022: Comment; FABIAN CAPETILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERRERA, SAMUEL : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 85050-2021-DCLK; HERRERA, SAMUEL $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HERRERA, SAMUEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: HERRERA, SAMUEL ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Kevin Carey