This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/29/2022 at 08:56:53 (UTC).

ROCKLAN B. HAYNES vs. CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 ROCKLAN B HAYNES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M and SMITH, CRAIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1801

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

SMITH, CRAIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYNES, ROCKLAN B.

Flint, TX 75762

Defendants

CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

811 Main St Ste 2900

Houston, TX 77002

CHESAPEAKE OPERATING, L.L.C.

811 Main St Ste 2900

Houston, TX 77002

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LTD.

1635 N E Loop 410, San

Antonio, TX 78209

C.C. FORBES, LLC

1635 Ne Loop 410 Ste 900, San

Antonio, TX 78209

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LLC

1635 N E Loop 410 Ste 900, San

Antonio, TX 78209

A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC.

750 Bering Dr Ste 600

Houston, TX 77057

SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC

5151 San Felipe Ste 750

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WORTHINGTON, JOE

NEGEM, JIMMY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

NORRIS, JOSHUA A

ZITO, NICHOLAS E

DOHERTY, BRENDAN P

FIELDS, CHARLOTTE A

 

Court Documents

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192ND TRIAL RESET LETTER NON-JURY

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

ZOOM - A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC PLEA TO JURISDICTION & 91A MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: - ZOOM - ON A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC'S PLEA TO THE JURISDICATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, RULE 91A MOTION TO DISMISS IN MDL-21-00001

192 DWOPNO ACTION Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: - ZOOM - ON A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC'S PLEA TO THE JURISDICATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, RULE 91A MOTION TO DISMISS IN MDL-21-00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; HAYNES, ROCKLAN B.: Awarded Against:; CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13/TAG-ALONG CASE; Comment: RE: DC-21-11801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: - UNIFORM / LEVEL 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: - UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HAYNES, ROCKLAN B. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 57039-2021-DCLK; HAYNES, ROCKLAN B. $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HAYNES, ROCKLAN B. : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: HAYNES, ROCKLAN B. ; Total Financial Assessment $292.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CC FORBES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A&L HOT OIL SERVICE, INC. is a litigant