This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 19:58:58 (UTC).

ROBERT CLAY SHIELDS vs. 3M COMPANY , et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 ROBERT CLAY SHIELDS filed an Other lawsuit against 3M COMPANY . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3980

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIELDS, ROBERT CLAY

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendants

3M COMPANY

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

4520 CORPORATION, INC.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

ABLE SUPPLY CO.

5220 Texas Avenue

Houston,, TX 77011

AMETEK, INC.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

ASHLAND, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

5215 N. O Conner Blvd, Ste 2300

Irving, TX 75039

CHAMPION OIL COMPANY

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION

9560 Plaza Circle, El

Paso, TX 79927

CRANE CO.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

ELLIOTT COMPANY f/k/a and d/b/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

FLOWSERVE US, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

FMC CORPORATION

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

HERCULES LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, DARREN

Other Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

 

Court Documents

MISCELLANOUS EVENT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: COA DOCKET

ORDER - MISC.

ORDER - MISC.; Comment: REMAND

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER; Comment: RE: REMAND ORDER

NOTICE OF SUBSEQUENT TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13 OF TAG-ALONG CASE

NOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13/TAG-ALONG CASE

EXECUTED CITATION - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION

EXECUTED CITATION - THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

EXECUTED CITATION - THE GOOD YEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE GOOD YEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

EXECUTED CITATION (SOS)- WARREN PUMPS LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - WARREN PUMPS LLC

EXECUTED CITATION - VIACOMCBS INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - VIACOMCBS INC

ISSUE CITATION- ABLE COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-4520 CORP

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- 3M COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - BW IP INTERNATIONAL, INC. (SOS)

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

ISSUE CITATION - GOULD PUMPS, INC. (SOS)

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

ISSUE CITATION - INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY (SOS)

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

ISSUE CITATION - STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC (SOS)

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

ISSUE CITATION - WARREN PUMPS, LLC (SOS)

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: COA DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MISC.; Comment: REMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER; Comment: RE: REMAND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13/TAG-ALONG CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE GOOD YEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - WARREN PUMPS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - VIACOMCBS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - VALERO REFINING- TEXAS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHIELDS, ROBERT CLAY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHIELDS, ROBERT CLAY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 23058-2022-DCLK; Shields, Robert Clay $497.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHIELDS, ROBERT CLAY : Transaction Assessment; ; $634.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SHIELDS, ROBERT CLAY ; Total Financial Assessment $634.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $634.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERCULES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where Blount International Inc. is a litigant