This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 11/30/2022 at 01:16:17 (UTC).

RELATED MANAGEMENT vs. JIMMIE WILLIAMS, & ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 RELATED MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JIMMIE WILLIAMS, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********82-C

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RELATED MANAGEMENT

6300 La Calma Drive Ste-150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

WILLIAMS, JIMMIE

Irving, TX 75063

& ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEITH, CATHERINE A

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

ORDER - DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 02:10 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 02:10 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 02:10 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 02:10 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 11:40 AM

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDIC

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: (AWAITING EMAIL RESP RE FUNDS IN REGISTRY) NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: NONSUIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE - APPEARANCE

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 02:10 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: C/O CATHERINE A KEITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: C/O JIMMIE WILLIAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: (PER ATTY, TENANT WILL RECV FUNDS IN REGISTRY) NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, JIMMIE : INABILITY TO PAY; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, JIMMIE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: WILLIAMS, JIMMIE ; Total Financial Assessment $350.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ; RELATED MANAGEMENT ; Total Financial Assessment $0.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT INABILITY TO PAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketJP MISC FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP APPEAL (OCA - CASES APPEALED FROM LOWER COURTS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEITH, CATHERINE A