This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/17/2022 at 19:59:05 (UTC).

PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC vs. GREGORY MOCK, et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GREGORY MOCK. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0533

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC

Defendants

MOCK, GREGORY

Dallas, TX 75229

MOCK, MARY MARGARET

Dallas, TX 75229

DALLAS COUNTY, CITY OF DALLAS, DALLAS SCHOOL EQUALIZATION, DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, DALLAS COLLEGE, PARKLAND HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUERRA, LIA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LIA GUERRA

REQUEST CITATIONS

REQUEST CITATIONS

ISSUE CITATION - DALLAS COUNTY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - GREGORY MOCK

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - MARY MARGARET MOCK

ISSUE CITATION

EXEC - MARY MARGARET MOCK

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MARY MARGARET MOCK

EXEC - GREGORY MOCK

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - GREGORY MOCK

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL - MARY AND GREGORY MOCK

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

Non Jury Trial GREGORY

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GREGORY MOCK

Non Jury Trial MARY

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MARY MARGARET MOCK

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MARY MARGARET MOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GREGORY MOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - GREGORY MOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MARY MARGARET MOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/05/2022; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Served; 05/05/2022: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2-PRIVATE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 21257-2022-DCLK; PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC $313.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, AS AGENT AND ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR FNA VI, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $450.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LIA GUERRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Propel Financial Services LLC, as Agent and Attorney in Fact for TLF National Tax Li is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lia D Guerra