This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/09/2023 at 02:05:33 (UTC).

PLAINSCAPITAL BANK vs. LYNNE PAGE CLARKE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 PLAINSCAPITAL BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LYNNE PAGE CLARKE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7481

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLAINSCAPITAL BANK

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

CLARKE, LYNNE PAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PULLMAN, RICHARD D

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS, BRIAN J

 

Court Documents

APP-WRIT GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ISSUE WRIT - LYNNE PAGE CLARKE, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF JUNE BENNER PAGE

ISSUE WRIT

EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - LYNNE PAGE CLARKE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - LYNNE PAGE CLARKE

ORIGINAL ANSWER & PLEA IN ABATEMENT

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: & PLEA IN ABATEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: & PLEA IN ABATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - LYNNE PAGE CLARKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Served: 01/04/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/09/2023: Comment; LYNNE PAGE CLARKE, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF JUNE BENNER PAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PLAINSCAPITAL BANK : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PLAINSCAPITAL BANK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 79962-2022-DCLK; PLAINSCAPITAL BANK $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PLAINSCAPITAL BANK : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: PLAINSCAPITAL BANK ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less