This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/26/2022 at 01:26:14 (UTC).

PAUL EASY vs. TONYA BELLO, KECHEON EKIMANDO BELLO, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 PAUL EASY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TONYA BELLO, KECHEON EKIMANDO BELLO, UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BENSON, D'METRIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********32-A

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BENSON, D'METRIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EASY, PAUL

Defendants

BELLO, TONYA

Dallas, TX 75232

BELLO, KECHEON EKIMANDO

Dallas, TX 75237

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

1999 Bryant Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADDISON, ROBERT L.

Defendant Attorney

WALTERS, RANDALL G

 

Court Documents

amended order-unsigned-granting alternate service on def kecheon bello 050922.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: FILING LTR RE-AMENDED ORDER FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF. KECHEON BELLO

CORRESPONDENCE

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: FILING LTR RE-AMENDED ORDER FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF. KECHEON BELLO

amended order-unsigned-granting alternate service on def tonya bello 050922.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: PLF[S FILING LTR. RE-AMENDED ORDER FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF. TONYA BELLO

CORRESPONDENCE

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: PLF[S FILING LTR. RE-AMENDED ORDER FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF. TONYA BELLO

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

NOTICE - DEFICIENCY

NOTICE - DEFICIENCY

MOTION FIRST AMENDED SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

AMENDED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 60705382

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FILING LETTER RE-PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: FILING LTR RE-AMENDED ORDER FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF. KECHEON BELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: PLF[S FILING LTR. RE-AMENDED ORDER FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE ON DEF. TONYA BELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Original Type: DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: HEARING HELD; Comment: 2x amd 106 motions await review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - DEFICIENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: AMD AS TO KECHEON BELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: AMD AS TO TONYA BELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: PLF'S FILING LTR RE-MOTIONS FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - DEFICIENCY; Comment: M/106 ON DEFT KECHEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Comment: AS TO UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for EASY, PAUL : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-00242; EASY, PAUL $237.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for EASY, PAUL : Transaction Assessment; ; $374.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: EASY, PAUL ; Total Financial Assessment $374.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $374.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: KECHEONEKIMANDO BELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: TONYA BELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 60705382

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FILING LETTER RE-PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANDALL G WALTERS