This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 19:22:07 (UTC).

PAUL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC, et al vs. JOHN A STAHL, et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 PAUL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JOHN A STAHL. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is HOFFMAN, MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6482

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAUL CAPITAL ADVISORS LLC

PAUL CAPITAL TOWN STREET PARTNERS, L.P.

PAUL CAPITAL PARTNERS IX, L.P.

PAUL CAPITAL PARTNERS VIII HOLDINGS

PAUL CAPITAL PARTNERS VIII-C, L.P.

PAUL CAPITAL PARTNERS VIII-B, L.P.

PAUL CAPITAL PARTNERS VIII-A, L.P.

Defendants

STAHL, JOHN A

MHT FINANCIAL, L.L.C.

DELAWARE TRUST COMPANY

TURVEY, JAMES E

HOLLAND, MURRAY T

BENEFICIENT MANAGEMENT COUNSELORS, L.L.C.

HIGHLAND REAL ASSETS, L.L.C.

BENEFICIENT HOLDINGS, Inc.

HIGHLAND CONSOLIDATED, L.P.

BENEFICIENT COMPANY HOLDINGS, L.P.

BENEFICIENT MANAGMENT, L.L.C.

HIGHLAND CONSOLIDATED BUSINESS HOLDINGS GP L.L.C.

THE BENEFICIENT COMPANY GROUP, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, RUBEN A

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP: EITHER DEFT HAS NOT BEEN SERV'D OR A DEFLT HAS NOT BEEN RCV'D - MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - SENT TO RUBEN A. GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PAUL CAPITAL TOWN STREET PARTNERS, L.P. : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PAUL CAPITAL TOWN STREET PARTNERS, L.P. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 37482-2022-DCLK; PAUL CAPITAL TOWN STREET PARTNERS, L.P. $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PAUL CAPITAL TOWN STREET PARTNERS, L.P. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: PAUL CAPITAL TOWN STREET PARTNERS, L.P. ; Total Financial Assessment $350.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware Trust Company is a litigant