This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 14:22:43 (UTC).

PATRICIA SMITH vs. CURTIS SMITH

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 PATRICIA SMITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CURTIS SMITH. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Family District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is COOKS, KIM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4054

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

COOKS, KIM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, PATRICIA KAY

Respondent

SMITH, CURTIS BRYAN

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SMITH, CHRISTOPHER LOU

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: COOKS, KIM; Judgment Type: JUDGMENT NON-JURY; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; SMITH, PATRICIA KAY: Awarded Against:; SMITH, CURTIS BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED FINAL DECREE*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SMITH, PATRICIA KAY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 56151-2021-DCLK; SMITH, PATRICIA KAY $297.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SMITH, PATRICIA KAY : Transaction Assessment; ; $297.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: SMITH, PATRICIA KAY ; Total Financial Assessment $297.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $297.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, CHRISTOPHER LOU