This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 02:43:50 (UTC).

PATRICIA CHADWICK CRYER vs. DAIMLER AG, et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 PATRICIA CHADWICK CRYER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAIMLER AG. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7106

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK

Defendants

DAIMLER AG

1209 Orange St.

Wilmington, DE 19801

MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC

1209 Orange St.

Wilmington, DE 19801

DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

1209 Orange St.

Wilmington, DE 19801

PARK PLACE DEALERSHIP ARLINGTON, LLC

4201 Beltway Pl

Arlington, TX 76018-1036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOODS, LONNIE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

dism letter (116th)

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

ISSUE CITATION - 1. DAIMLER AG (REISSUE)

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 2. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (MB USA) REISSUE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3. DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION (DNAC) REISSUE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 4. PARK PLACE DEALERSHIPS ARLINGTON LLC (REISSUE)

ISSUE CITATION

LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION - 1. DAIMLER AG

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 2. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (MB USA)

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3. DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION (DNAC)

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 4. PARK PLACE DEALERSHIPS ARLINGTON LLC

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR ISSUE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: PARK PLACE DEALERSHIPS ARLINGTON LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: DAIMLER NORTH AMERICACORPORATION (DNAC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (MB USA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: DAIMLER AG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 1696-2022-DCLK; CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: PARK PLACE DEALERSHIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: DAIMLER AG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 81119-2021-DCLK; CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 78685-2021-DCLK; CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: CRYER, PATRICIA CHADWICK ; Total Financial Assessment $356.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $356.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLER AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Daimler North America Corporation is a litigant