This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 18:54:25 (UTC).

ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC vs. U-HAUL CO. , et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U-HAUL CO . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3382

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC

Defendants

U-HAUL CO.

1999 Bryan Street, Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

CANDLER, SHAREN NICOLE

Irving, TX 75039

DOE, JOHN

CANDLER, SHARENA NICOLE

Irving, TX 75039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUKES, JOURDAN J

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER FOR ISSUE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - U-HAUL CO

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - U-HAUL CO

MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: WITH PREJUDICE

PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC; Awarded Against:; U-HAUL CO., et al

ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC: Awarded Against:; U-HAUL CO., et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Comment: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CITATION - U-HAUL CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: SHARENA NICOLE CANDLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 04/06/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 04/11/2022: Comment; U-HAUL CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 19021-2022-DCLK; ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U-Haul Co of Colorado is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jourdan Jackson Dukes