This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/30/2023 at 02:56:50 (UTC).

OMAR ZARAGOZA vs. ERICK G TOBAR, et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 OMAR ZARAGOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERICK G TOBAR,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, CRAIG and ACEVES, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7091

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, CRAIG

ACEVES, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZARAGOZA, OMAR

Defendants

TOBAR, ERICK G

GD CONSTRUCTION INC

TEXAS ONE TELECOMM ONE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH, LEIGH A

SUTLIFF, GRAHAM E

PLOEGER, MATTHTEW B.

Defendant Attorneys

COX, CLINTON V., IV

RENNEKER, ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

VACATION LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: VACATION LETTER

AGREED ORDER GRANTING SEVERANCE & ABATEMENT - JASON KERR

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: - MAILED COPIES/AGREED ORDER GRANTING SEVERANCE & ABATEMENT/PLAINTIFF & NAMED DEFENDANT ATTORNEYS

AGREED ORDER GRANTING SEVERANCE & ABATEMENT - LEIGH A JOSEPH

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: - MAILED COPIES/AGREED ORDER GRANTING SEVERANCE & ABATEMENT/PLAINTIFF & NAMED DEFENDANT ATTORNEYS

AGREED SEVER/ABATE

ORDER - SEVER; Comment: - & ABATE

PROPOSED ORDER AGREED SEVER/ABATE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED SEVER/ABATE

MOTION ENTER ORDER/DEF CINCINNATI INSURANCE AGREED ORDER SEVER/ABATE

MOTION - ENTER ORDER; Comment: DEFENDANT CINCINNATI INSURANCE ENTRY AGREED ORDER SEVER/ABATE

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ISSUE CITATION - GD CONSTRUCTION INC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - ERICK G TOBAR

ISSUE CITATION

FP FILE DESK JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: VACATION LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: - MAILED COPIES/AGREED ORDER GRANTING SEVERANCE & ABATEMENT/PLAINTIFF & NAMED DEFENDANT ATTORNEYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SEVER; Comment: - & ABATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED SEVER/ABATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ENTER ORDER; Comment: ENTRY AGREED ORDER SEVER/ABATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Compel; Judicial Officer: ACEVES, MARIA; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: (VIA ZOOM) 30M ANDREA 713-987-7111

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: - ASCENSION SETON BASTROP HOSPITAL - RADIOLOGY - RADIOLOGY FILMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: - QUANTUM PAIN & ORTHOPEDICS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/01/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 08/02/2022: Comment; ERICK G TOBAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZARAGOZA, OMAR : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZARAGOZA, OMAR : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 39810-2022-DCLK; ZARAGOZA, OMAR $239.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZARAGOZA, OMAR : Transaction Assessment; ; $376.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ZARAGOZA, OMAR ; Total Financial Assessment $392.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $392.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial:; TOBAR, ERICK G ; Total Financial Assessment $0.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less