This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 18:11:57 (UTC).

OGHENETEGA OBRUTSE vs. RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE, INC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 OGHENETEGA OBRUTSE filed an Other lawsuit against RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE, INC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1073

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OBRUTSE, OGHENETEGA

Defendants

RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE, INC

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

4000 Jackson Ave

Austin, TX 78731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL, SHARON K

Defendant Attorney

COSPER, CRAIG W

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION - RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE, INC D/B/A RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE BODY SHOP

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

ISSUE CITATION

DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER/PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION

PLEA TO JURISDICTION; Comment: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA TO JURISDICTION; Comment: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE INC d/b/a RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE BODY SHOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for OBRUTSE, OGHENETEGA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for OBRUTSE, OGHENETEGA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 54325-2022-DCLK; OBRUTSE, OGHENETEGA $229.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for OBRUTSE, OGHENETEGA : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: OBRUTSE, OGHENETEGA ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICHARDSON AUTOMOTIVE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of Motor Vehicles is a litigant