This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 14:40:24 (UTC).

O FORECLOSURE et al vs. VANDI J CLARK et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 O FORECLOSURE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VANDI J CLARK. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1359

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC

101 W Louis Henna Blvd Ste 450

Austin, TX 78728

O FORECLOSURE

Dallas, TX 75209

Defendants

CLARK, VANDI J

Lancaster, TX 75146

OCCUPANT

Lancaster, TX 75146

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHERER, GEORGE COLBY

TRAYNOR, PHILIP S

Defendant Attorney

PAGE, KRISTINA L

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION TO ABATE

MOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: 15M ON MOTION TO ABATE - SET BY KRISTINA 214-736-1324 VIA ZOOM

PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO ABATE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO ABATE

STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ABATE

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ABATE

MOTION TO ABATE

MOTION - ABATEMENT

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

193rd Final Hearing (Appl Foreclosure) Whitmore

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: O'FORECLOSURE HEARING

193rd Final Hearing (Appl Foreclosure) Whitmore

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: O'FORECLOSURE HEARING

193rd Final Hearing (Appl Foreclosure) Whitmore

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: O'FORECLOSURE HEARING

193rd Final Hearing (Appl Foreclosure) Whitmore

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: O'FORECLOSURE HEARING

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: (LEVEL 2)

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ABATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: 15M ON MOTION TO ABATE - SET BY KRISTINA 214-736-1324 VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForeclosure; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ABATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO ABATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/14/2022; Anticipated Server: MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; MAIL: Returned; 02/14/2022: Comment; REG-MAIL VANDI J CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/14/2022; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 02/14/2022: Comment; CERT-MAIL VANDI J CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR AN EXPEDITED ORDER UNDER RULE 736 ON REVERSE MORTGAGE LOAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 6820-2022-DCLK; FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC $573.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $710.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $710.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $710.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR EXPEDITED ORDER UNDER RULE 736 ON REVERSE MORTGAGE LOAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGE, KRISTINA L