This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/15/2022 at 19:31:09 (UTC).

O FORCLOSURE, et al vs. MILTON E MARTINEZ et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 O FORCLOSURE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MILTON E MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9296

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP

O FORECLOSURE

Dallas, TX 75209

Defendants

MARTINEZ , MILTON E

Wilmer, TX 75172

VILLALOBOS , JERICKA

Wilmer, TX 75172

OCCUPANT

Wilmer, TX 75172

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHNEIDER, CHELSEA

 

Court Documents

FIRM COVER LETTER

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION-JERICKA VILLALOBOS CERT

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-MILTON E MARTINEZ CERT

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATIONOCCUPANT- CERT

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-JERICKA VILLALOBOS- REG MAIL

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION-OCCUPANT- REG MAIL

ISSUE CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE-OCCUPANT- REG MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OCCUPANT- REG MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE-JERICKA VILLALOBOS-REG MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: JERICKA VILLALOBOS- REG MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE-OCCUPANT- CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OCCUPANT- CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE--MILTON E MARTINEZ-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: -MILTON E MARTINEZ-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE-JERICKA VILLALOBOS-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: JERICKA VILLALOBOS-CERT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: JERICKA VILLALOBOS-CERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: -MILTON E MARTINEZ-CERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OCCUPANT- CERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: JERICKA VILLALOBOS- REG MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: MILTON E MARTINEZ- REG MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OCCUPANT- REG MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/23/2022; Anticipated Server: MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; MAIL: Returned; 08/23/2022: Comment; MILTON E MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/23/2022; Anticipated Server: MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; MAIL: Returned; 08/23/2022: Comment; JERICKA VILLALOBOS-REG MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/23/2022; Anticipated Server: MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; MAIL: Returned; 08/23/2022: Comment; OCCUPANT REG MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/23/2022; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 08/23/2022: Comment; OCCUPANT- CERT-9207 1901 0661 5400 0178 3526 70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/23/2022; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 08/23/2022: Comment; JERICKA VILLALOBOS CERT-9207 1901 0661 5400 0178 3524 58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/23/2022; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 08/23/2022: Comment; MILTON E MARTINEZ-CERT 9207 1901 0661 5400 0178 3525 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 49235-2022-DCLK; JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP $759.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP : Transaction Assessment; ; $896.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP ; Total Financial Assessment $896.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $896.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chelsea Schneider