This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/12/2023 at 01:39:18 (UTC).

O FORECLOSURE et al vs. DWIGHT BREWER et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 O FORECLOSURE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DWIGHT BREWER. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0249

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

O FORECLOSURE

Defendants

BREWER, DWIGHT

BREWER, SHARON

OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DEMUTH, AARON

BARTEE, NICOLE M

GLADNEY, DANYA F

 

Court Documents

SERVICEMEMBERS AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: SERVICEMEMBER'S

CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

PROPOSED ORDER OF FORECLOSURE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF HEARING

/ FIAT; NOTICE OF HEARING: Comment; ON APPL ALLOWING FORECLOSURE

134th Trial Notice Letters

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL w LEVEL 1 USO

SCHEDULING ORDER

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: to OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY; SHARON BREWER and DWIGHT BREWER via USPS

134th Trial Notice Letters

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: to OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY; SHARON BREWER and DWIGHT BREWER via USPS

134th Trial Notice Letters

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: to OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY; SHARON BREWER and DWIGHT BREWER via USPS

134th Trial Notice Letters

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: to OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY; SHARON BREWER and DWIGHT BREWER via USPS

ORIGINAL ANSWER - DWIGHT BREWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

RETURN OF SERVICE-OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY-MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY-MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE-OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE-SHARON BREWER-MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SHARON BREWER-MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE-SHARON BREWER-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SHARON BREWER-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE-DWIGHT BREWER-MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: DWIGHT BREWER-MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE-DWIGHT BREWER-CERT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: DWIGHT BREWER-CERT

ISSUE CITATION-OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY-MAIL

ISSUE CITATION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 15 MIN RULE 736 BEN 281-925-5233

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: SERVICEMEMBER'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket/ FIAT; NOTICE OF HEARING: Comment; ON APPL ALLOWING FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL w LEVEL 1 USO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: to OCCUPANT OF THE PROPERTY; SHARON BREWER and DWIGHT BREWER via USPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/12/2023; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 01/12/2023: Comment; SHARON BREWER-CERT 9207 1901 0661 5400 0182 3122 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/12/2023; Anticipated Server: MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; MAIL: Returned; 01/12/2023: Comment; DWIGHT BREWER-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/12/2023; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 01/12/2023: Comment; DWIGHT BREWER-CERT 9207 1901 0661 5400 0182 3122 02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 1272-2023-DCLK; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY $735.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $872.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $872.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $872.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less