This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/26/2022 at 18:19:55 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF HENRY NGWILI

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 GUARDIANSHIP OF HENRY NGWILI was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WARREN, INGRID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********36-2

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WARREN, INGRID

 

Party Details

Applicant

NGWILI, REGINAH MBULA

Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr.

 

Court Documents

NGWILI.APP.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

NGWILI.JBCC.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE-REGINAH NGWILI

Posted Notice - Application for Letters of Guardianship

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/27/22

ORDER.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; CONSTABLE: Comment; RTN:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 06/13/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 06/14/2022; Comment: RTN: 6/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-09527; O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : Transaction Assessment; ; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. ; Total Financial Assessment $25.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE-REGINAH NGWILI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NGWILI, REGINAH MBULA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NGWILI, REGINAH MBULA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-09130; NGWILI, REGINAH MBULA $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NGWILI, REGINAH MBULA : Transaction Assessment; ; $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: NGWILI, REGINAH MBULA ; Total Financial Assessment $482.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMEDICAL REPORT OR LETTER; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MEDICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D. O'Connor