This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 11/17/2022 at 03:51:40 (UTC).

NATASHA KHASACHA vs. FLOR HERNANDEZ ARGUETA, FLOR MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 NATASHA KHASACHA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FLOR HERNANDEZ ARGUETA, FLOR MENDOZA. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSALES, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********51-D

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROSALES, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHASACHA, NATASHA

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendants

ARGUETA, FLOR HERNANDEZ

Arlington, TX 76010

MENDOZA, FLOR

Arlington, TX 76010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STUCKY, RICHARD A.

Defendant Attorney

EGHAREVBA, NATASHA E

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION(JURY DEMAND)

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION(JURY DEMAND)

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE, ENV# 67928673

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE, ENV# 67928673

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

FLOR HERNANDEZ ARGUETA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: FLOR HERNANDEZ ARGUETA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

FLOR MENDOZA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: FLOR MENDOZA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

CCL#4 TR/REV/JURY

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#4 TR/REV/JURY

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#4 TR/REV/JURY

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: FLOR MENDOZA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: FLOR HERNANDEZ ARGUETA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KHASACHA, NATASHA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KHASACHA, NATASHA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-08549; KHASACHA, NATASHA $229.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KHASACHA, NATASHA : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: KHASACHA, NATASHA ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE, ENV# 67928673

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natasha Ehi Egharevba