This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 13:53:03 (UTC).

MICHAEL JAMES vs. JENNIFER MORA

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 MICHAEL JAMES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JENNIFER MORA. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Family District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, KIM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6107

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, KIM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAMES, MICHAEL

Respondent

MORA, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALEXANDER, TIMOTHY JAMES

Respondent Attorney

STEWART, JOHN ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: BROWN, KIM; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; JAMES, MICHAEL: Awarded Against:; MORA, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket*DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: BROWN, KIM; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for JAMES, MICHAEL : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 23173-2021-DCLK; JAMES, MICHAEL $297.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for JAMES, MICHAEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $297.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: JAMES, MICHAEL ; Total Financial Assessment $297.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $297.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - FAMILY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER, TIMOTHY JAMES