This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/11/2022 at 09:00:54 (UTC).

MICHAEL ARANDA vs. KIBREAB MEBRAHTU, et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 MICHAEL ARANDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KIBREAB MEBRAHTU,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4284

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARANDA , MICHAEL

Defendants

MEBRAHTU, KIBREAB

Lorton, VA 22079

BLESSED TRANS LLC

1925 Spencer Ln

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORENO, FLORENCIO J

Defendant Attorney

LAIDLAW, DONALD

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

RETURNED MAIL NOTICE JURY TRIAL-BLESSED TRANS LLC/FISHA BISRAT

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE JURY TRIAL-BLESSED TRANS LLC/FISHA H BISRAT

PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; ARANDA , MICHAEL, et al; Awarded Against:; ARANDA , MICHAEL, et al

191st JURY TRIAL LETTER

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st JURY TRIAL LETTER

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st JURY TRIAL LETTER

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

191st JURY TRIAL LETTER

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

PROPOSED ORDER TO SUBST SERVICE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO SUBST SERVICE

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED CITATION (COH) - KIBREAB MEBRAHTU

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (COH)- KIBREAB MEBRAHTU

RETURNED MAIL NOTICE INTENT DISMISS-BLESSED TRANS/FISHA BISRAT

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISMISS-BLESSED TRANS LLC/FISHA H BISRAT

1 9 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

1 9 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

1 9 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ISSUE CITATION COMM - 2. KIBREAB MEBRAHTU (COH - ESERVE)

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY TO PLT AND DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; ARANDA , MICHAEL, et al: Awarded Against:; ARANDA , MICHAEL, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE JURY TRIAL-BLESSED TRANS LLC/FISHA H BISRAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO SUBST SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (COH)- KIBREAB MEBRAHTU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: BLESSED TRANS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARANDA , MICHAEL : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARANDA , MICHAEL : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 24744-2022-DCLK; ARANDA , MICHAEL $243.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARANDA , MICHAEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $380.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ARANDA , MICHAEL ; Total Financial Assessment $380.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $380.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAIDLAW, DONALD