This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 03/13/2023 at 19:11:10 (UTC).

MEGAN REDLICH vs.AIRBNB, INC., JEFFREY GODON

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 MEGAN REDLICH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AIRBNB, INC , JEFFREY GODON. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BENSON, D'METRIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********01-A

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BENSON, D'METRIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDLICH, MEGAN

Defendants

AIRBNB, INC.

211 E. 7Th St., Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

GODON, JEFFREY

Branch, TX 75234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWNE, SPENCER P

Defendant Attorney

ENGLAND, JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 71884838

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 71884838

RETURN OF SERVICE AIRBNB INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE AIRBNB INC

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE AIRBNB INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 01/20/20233:25 PM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/30/2023 12:56 PM: Comment; JEFFREY GODON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: AIRBNB, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for REDLICH, MEGAN : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for REDLICH, MEGAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2023-00360; REDLICH, MEGAN $229.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for REDLICH, MEGAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: REDLICH, MEGAN ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 71884838

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less