This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/31/2022 at 02:59:46 (UTC).

MARTHA SANCHEZ, SHALIMAR SANCHEZ, SADIE SANCHEZ vs. AMICA GENERAL AGENCY OF TEXAS, INC. , GABRIEL HERNANDEZ, AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 MARTHA SANCHEZ, SHALIMAR SANCHEZ, SADIE SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMICA GENERAL AGENCY OF TEXAS, INC , GABRIEL HERNANDEZ, AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********66-C

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCHEZ, MARTHA

SANCHEZ, SHALIMAR

SANCHEZ, SADIE

Defendants

AMICA GENERAL AGENCY OF TEXAS, INC.

14090 Southwest Freeway, Suite 500, Sugar

Land, TX 77478

HERNANDEZ, GABRIEL

Garland, TX 75041

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

2150 Town Square Pl, Suite 600, Sugar

Land, TX 77479

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SERCELY, MATTHEW D

Defendant Attorney

BENNETT, PAUL WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

PLFT NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

RETURNED MAIL - AMICA GENERAL AGECNY OF TEXAS, INC.; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL HEARING

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: AMICA GENERAL AGECNY OF TEXAS, INC.; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL HEARING

DEFENDANT S JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #64803183

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #64803183

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: AMICA GENERAL AGECNY OF TEXAS, INC.; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY REGISTERED AGENT: AMY WALSINGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ, MARTHA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-05334; SANCHEZ, MARTHA $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ, MARTHA : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ, MARTHA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ, MARTHA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-04806; SANCHEZ, MARTHA $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANCHEZ, MARTHA : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SANCHEZ, MARTHA ; Total Financial Assessment $374.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $374.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: GABRIEL HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: AMICA GENERAL AGENCY OF TEXAS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #64803183

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amica Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENNETT, PAUL WILLIAM