This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/14/2022 at 19:46:53 (UTC).

MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN vs. CITY OF DALLAS, DALLAS COUNTY

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF DALLAS, DALLAS COUNTY. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BELLAN, MELISSA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********72-B

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BELLAN, MELISSA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN

Defendants

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75201

DALLAS COUNTY

411 Elm Street, 5Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWNE, SPENCER P

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #66323545

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 66662544

1878ros22s.pdf

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVED CITY OF DALLAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVED CITY OF DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: DALLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-06941; MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 66662544

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-06593; TREJO, MARICELA $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: MARICELA TREJO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND AND LEGAL GUARDIAN ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 07/20/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; CITY OF DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #66323545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer P Browne