This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 07/30/2022 at 23:07:49 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF MARTIN TORRES

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 GUARDIANSHIP OF MARTIN TORRES was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********31-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Applicants

MACIAS, JUAN TORRES

Dallas, TX 75203

TORRES, ROSALINA DIAS

Dallas, TX 75203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr.

 

Court Documents

TORRES.APP.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANS OF THE PERSON

TORRES.WAIVER.GERARDO.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - GERARDO

TORRES.WAIVER.LUIS.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - LUIS

TORRES.WAIVER.JUAN.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - JUAN

Posted Notice - Application for Letters of Guardianship

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/25/22

JBCC.JUAN.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - JUAN TORRES MACIAS

JBCC.ROSALINA.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - ROSALINA TORRESS

ORDER.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 5: Anticipated Method; CONSTABLE: Comment; RTN:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 07/11/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 07/12/2022; Comment: RTN: 7/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/25/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - ROSALINA TORRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - JUAN TORRES MACIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-10879; O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : Transaction Assessment; ; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. ; Total Financial Assessment $25.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - JUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING - GERARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMEDICAL REPORT OR LETTER; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MEDICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANS OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D. O'Connor