This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/15/2022 at 00:59:44 (UTC).

LUCY RICHARDS vs.WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION,, J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC., HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC.et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 LUCY RICHARDS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION,, J B HUNT TRANSPORT, INC , HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BELLAN, MELISSA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********42-B

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BELLAN, MELISSA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARDS, LUCY

Defendants

WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION,

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 76701

J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78711-2079

HOME PARTNERS OF AMERICA, LLC

12079, Citation Unit

Austin, TX 78701-2079

HPA II TEXAS SUB 2019 1 LLC

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

OPVHHJV, LLC, D/B/A PATHLIGHT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

BLOOMFIELD HOMES, LP

12221 Merit Drive, Suite1750

Dallas, TX 75251

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYONS, MICHAEL P

Defendant Attorneys

PENDROFF, BENJAMIN T

MAYER, ZACH T

LAST, MATTHEW

BEZNEY, PAUL A.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND- OWES $56 IN ISSUANCE FEE-GUISLA

Notice of Hearing.pdf

NOTICE - HEARING

ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT

ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT; Comment: AGAINTS DEFENDANT'S HPA II TEXAS SUB 2019 1 LLC AND HOME PARTNERS OF AMERICA, LLC.

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

2022.07.20 Richards Nonsuit of HPA II Texas Sub 2019 1 and HPA.pdf

NOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: Plaintiff Non-suit WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS HPA II TEXAS SUB 2019 1 LLC AND HOME PARTNERS OF AMERICA, LLC

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

2022.07.19 - Defendant's Original Answer (Richards v. Bloomfield).pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

MOTION TO TRNAFER VENUE AND ORIGINAL ANSWER

MOTION - CONTEMPT; Comment: AND ORIGINAL ANSWER

MOTION TO TRANSFER

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

HPA & Pathlights Answer and MTV.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Lease Renewal 5.20.21.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Lease Renewal 5.19.22.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Lease_Docs_for_324_Tumbleweed_Trail_Waxahach.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketMOTION - TRANSFER; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Comment: KAREN ELDER 214-220-5223 (COURTCALL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT; Comment: AGAINTS DEFENDANT'S HPA II TEXAS SUB 2019 1 LLC AND HOME PARTNERS OF AMERICA, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS HPA II TEXAS SUB 2019 1 LLC AND HOME PARTNERS OF AMERICA, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-06811; HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-06766; HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: HOME PARTNERS REALTY TEXAS, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $160.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $160.00

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSERVICE - CERTIFIED / REGISTERED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 65784678 & 65878389/ TRACKING # 9414 8149 0238 8738 3424 06 FOR HOME PARTNERS OF AMERICA, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for RICHARDS, LUCY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for RICHARDS, LUCY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-05259; RICHARDS, LUCY $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for RICHARDS, LUCY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: RICHARDS, LUCY ; Total Financial Assessment $482.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $482.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLOOMFIELD HOMES, L.P is a litigant

Latest cases where HPA II Texas Sub 2019-1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Pathlight Property Management is a litigant

Latest cases where JB Hunt Transport, Inc. is a litigant