This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 05:39:14 (UTC).

LORIE CLIFT, et al vs. AVON PRODUCTS, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 LORIE CLIFT filed an Other lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS, INC . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5640

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLIFT, LORIE

Dallas, TX 75270

FUTCH, CHRISTOPHER

Dallas, TX 75270

MCCOY, LESLIE

Dallas, TX 75270

Defendants

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

BAYER SAMSON II LLC

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC for its Dr. Scholl's line of products

HIMMEL MANAGEMENT CO. LLC

DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

AVON PRODUCTS, INC.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

CHATTEM, INC. a subsidiary of SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BLOCK DRUG CORPORATION, successor-in-interest to THE GOLD BOND STERILIZING POWDER COMPANY a/k/a THE GOLD BOND COMPANY)

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY, INC.

BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CHARLES OF THE RITZ) for its Jean Nate line of products

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. and as successor-in-interest to WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.)

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to THE GOLD BOND STERILIZING POWDER COMPANY a/k/a THE GOLD BOND COMPANY);

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

BEACON CMP CORPORATION

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, a subsidiary of BAYER AG, for its Dr. Scholl's line of products

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

f/k/a BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC .)

BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

MERCK & CO., INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION) for its Dr. Scholl's line of products

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, HOLLY C

Defendant Attorney

SPARDONE, STEPHANIE L

Other Attorneys

SCHWEGMANN, CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

SPECIAL APPEARANCE RE: MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

SPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: (BRENNTAG) RE: MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

DEFENDANT (BRENNTAG) SPECIAL APPEARANCE TO PRESENT MTN OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

SPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: (BRENNATAG) TO PRESENT MTN OBJECTIONG TO JURISDICTION

DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER-MARY KAY

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC

EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - ESTEE LAUDER INC3759.pdf

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - ESTEE LAUDER INC

EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

EXECUTED CITATION - COTY US LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - COTY US LLC

EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - COTY INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - COTY INC

ISSUE CITATION - 7. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 6. BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 5. BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 4. BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3. BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 2. BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 1. AVON PRODUCTS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CASE COVER SHEET

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: (BRENNTAG) RE: MOTION OBJECTING TO JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIAL APPEARANCE; Comment: (BRENNATAG) TO PRESENT MTN OBJECTIONG TO JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; AVON PRODUCTS, INC.: Awarded Against:; FUTCH, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13/TAG-ALONG CASE; Comment: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - ESTEE LAUDER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - COTY US LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - COTY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLIFT, LORIE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 32719-2022-DCLK; CLIFT, LORIE $651.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLIFT, LORIE : Transaction Assessment; ; $788.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: CLIFT, LORIE ; Total Financial Assessment $788.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $788.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. SCHOLL'S LLC a/k/a BAYER SAMSON II LLC; is a litigant

Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BARRETTS MINERALS INC is a litigant