This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:10:42 (UTC).

LORENZO BOTHO, NAYELI PEREZ, IND. AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF A MINOR vs. IRON MOUNTAIN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., RICKY J ROBINSON, ARI FLEET LLC AKA ARI FLEET LT et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 LORENZO BOTHO, NAYELI PEREZ, IND AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IRON MOUNTAIN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC , RICKY J ROBINSON, ARI FLEET LLC AKA ARI FLEET LT. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BENSON, D'METRIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********04-A

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BENSON, D'METRIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ, NAYELI

BOTHO, LORENZO

INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF A MINOR

Defendants

IRON MOUNTAIN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

ROBINSON, RICKY J

Dallas, TX 75243

ARI FLEET LLC AKA ARI FLEET LT

4001 Leadenhall Road, Mount

Laurel, NJ 08054

ARI FLEET SERVICES, INC.

4001 Leadenhill Road, Mount

Laurel, NJ 08054

HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

4001 Leadenhall Road, Mount

Laurel, NJ 08054

HOLMAN ENTERPRISES

4001 Leadenhall Road, Mount

Laurel, NJ 08054

HOLMAN FLEET LEASING, LLC

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

IRON MOUNTAIN FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

IRON MOUNTAIN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT, LLC

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAMPLES, STEVEN R

Defendant Attorneys

TRENARY, MORGAN R

REESE, FOSTER, III

 

Court Documents

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#1 DISMISSAL LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER DUE; Judicial Officer: BENSON, D'METRIA; Hearing Time: 4:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: JOINT ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Comment: JOINT MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE RICKY J. ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE ARI FLEET LLC AKA ARI FLEET LT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 03/25/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 04/04/2022 1:26 PM: Served; 03/25/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: OUT OF COUNTY; Returned: 04/04/2022 1:29 PM; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 03/25/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 04/04/2022 1:32 PM: Served; 03/28/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: OUT OF COUNTY; Returned: 04/04/2022; Served: 03/28/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 04/04/2022: Served; 03/28/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: OUT OF COUNTY; Returned: 04/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 04/05/20226:35 PM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 04/07/2022 2:20 PM: Unserved; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 03/25/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: OUT OF COUNTY; Returned: 04/07/2022 2:18 PM; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BOTHO, LORENZO : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BOTHO, LORENZO : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-02176; BOTHO, LORENZO $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BOTHO, LORENZO : Transaction Assessment; ; $422.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: BOTHO, LORENZO ; Total Financial Assessment $422.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $422.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-ERVE ENV# 62590707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IRON MOUNTAIN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARI FLEET LT A DELAWARE TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REESE, FOSTER, III