This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/22/2022 at 17:37:41 (UTC).

LARRY BROWN vs. MV CONTRACT TRANSPORTATION INC., DOMINIQUE KAILLY, IRVING HOLDINGS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 LARRY BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MV CONTRACT TRANSPORTATION INC , DOMINIQUE KAILLY, IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSALES, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********39-D

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROSALES, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, LARRY

Defendants

MV CONTRACT TRANSPORTATION INC.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

KAILLY, DOMINIQUE

Arlington, TX 76006

IRVING HOLDINGS, INC.

2515 Irving Boulevard

Dallas, TX 75207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWNE, SPENCER P

Defendant Attorneys

LANZA, NICHOLAS J

HOUSE, JOHN HOWELL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - MV CONTACT TRANSPORTATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: MV CONTACT TRANSPORTATION

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND; Comment: JURY DEMAND

DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 57921806

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

SECOND CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. S SECOND CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT DOMINIQUE KAILLY S SECOND CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

CCL#4 TR/REV/JURY

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#4 TR/REV/JURY

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#4 TR/REV/JURY

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

DOMINIQUE KAILLY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: DOMINIQUE KAILLY

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE

MOTION - LEAVE; Comment: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE THIRD PARTY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: ROSALES, PAULA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. S SECOND CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT DOMINIQUE KAILLY S SECOND CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: DOMINIQUE KAILLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - LEAVE; Comment: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE THIRD PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT DOMINIQUE KAILLY S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT MV CONTRACT TRANSPORTATION, INC. S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: MV CONTACT TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 10/07/20212:49 PM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/12/2021 9:48 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BROWN, LARRY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2021-10403; BROWN, LARRY $321.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BROWN, LARRY : Transaction Assessment; ; $321.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: BROWN, LARRY ; Total Financial Assessment $337.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $337.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 57921806

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MV CONTRACT TRANSPORTATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANZA, NICHOLAS J