This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/17/2022 at 15:03:13 (UTC).

LAND AIR EXPRESS, INC, GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY vs. K&M EXPRESS, LLC,, STEPHEN ZUHAIR ZORA KALA, GRACIELA YANEZ

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 LAND AIR EXPRESS, INC, GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against K M EXPRESS, LLC,, STEPHEN ZUHAIR ZORA KALA, GRACIELA YANEZ. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSALES, PAULA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********21-D

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROSALES, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAND AIR EXPRESS, INC

GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants

K&M EXPRESS, LLC,

6442 Epworth Street

Detroit, MI 48210

ZUHAIR ZORA KALA, STEPHEN

Heights, MI 48310

YANEZ, GRACIELA

Dallas, TX 75223

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHMIDT, LAURA DELYNNE

SMITH, LOREN R

Defendant Attorneys

DYER, MARK J

CAREY, J KEVIN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORDER - CONSOLIDATE

ORDER - CONSOLIDATE

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

3 CCL#4 Y LETTER

MOTION - CONSOLIDATE

MOTION - CONSOLIDATE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

DEFENDANT K&M EXPRESS, LLC S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: DEFENDANT K&M EXPRESS, LLC S ORIGINAL ANSWER

NOTICE - APPEARANCE

NOTICE - APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT GRACIELA YANEZ' ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: DEFENDANT GRACIELA YANEZ' ORIGINAL ANSWER

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: DEFENDANT K&M EXPRESS, LLC S ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: DEFENDANT GRACIELA YANEZ' ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-00094; Great West Casualty Company $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $392.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $392.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $392.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAND AIR EXPRESS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DYER, MARK J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Kevin Carey