This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 10/30/2023 at 21:41:00 (UTC).

KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC, et al vs. DAVID KREYE, et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC, filed an Other lawsuit against DAVID KREYE,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MOORE, MARICELA and WYSOCKI, ASHLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3717

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MOORE, MARICELA

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC

CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO LLC

Defendants

KREYE, DAVID

CANYON-ATLANTIC-TEXAS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAAS, ERIC PUTNAM

CAMP, JEREMY D.

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE DEFAULT JUDGMENT-CANYON ATLANTIC TEXAS LLC

FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a)

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a)

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Judgment Type; DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC; Awarded Against:; KREYE, DAVID, et al

162nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ISSUE CITATION - 1. DAVID KREYE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 2. CANYON ATLANTIC-TEXAS LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3. LEGACY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 4. DALLAS GROWTH CAPITAL AND FUNDING, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 5. ODBD, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 6. PENDRICK CAPITAL PARTNERS II, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR ISSUE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE DEFAULT JUDGMENT-CANYON ATLANTIC TEXAS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC: Awarded Against:; KREYE, DAVID, et al

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketDefault Prove-Up; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketPRE-TRIAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: ADMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: AS TO (KREYE & CANYON) (NO ORDER)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - NONSUIT; Comment: PARTIAL AS TO LEGACY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, DALLAS GROWTH CAPITAL & FUNDING , & OBDB LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
09/21/2021

DocketCITATION; Served: 09/23/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 09/24/2021: Comment; DAVID KREYE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2021

FinancialFinancial info for KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 62589-2021-DCLK; KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC $48.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2021

FinancialFinancial info for KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $48.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

FinancialFinancial info for KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 61960-2021-DCLK; KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC $292.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

FinancialFinancial info for KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

FinancialFinancial: KIRON HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $380.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $380.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2021

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less