This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/28/2022 at 23:00:56 (UTC).

KEVIN V. ANDERSON, WALTER BATSON vs. THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 KEVIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDERSON, WALTER BATSON. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********05-C

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON, KEVIN V.

Dallas, TX 75251

BATSON, WALTER

Defendant

THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STUCKY, RICHARD A.

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER, DEVIN Q.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #65120580

THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER; Comment: AND SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANDERSON, KEVIN V. : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANDERSON, KEVIN V. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-05205; ANDERSON, KEVIN V. $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANDERSON, KEVIN V. : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ANDERSON, KEVIN V. ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 06/08/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 06/09/2022: Comment; THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #65120580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER, DEVIN Q.