This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/07/2023 at 11:01:11 (UTC).

KATELYN ROSE LAWLER vs. SOCIAL BICYCLES, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 KATELYN ROSE LAWLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOCIAL BICYCLES, LLC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is REDMOND, AIESHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5493

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

REDMOND, AIESHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWLER, KATELYN ROSE

Houston, TX 77098

Defendants

SOCIAL BICYCLES, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

UBER, INC.

4001 State Hwy 121, The

Colony, TX 75056

UBER USA, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

UBER WORKS, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

UBER FREIGHT, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

UBER PAYMENTS, LLC

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

HATTEN, TIARA TYREON

Dallas, TX 75252-6391

JUMP BIKES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED, CLINT

Defendant Attorney

GROSWITH, JENNAFER

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION- HILL HEALS CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: HILL HEALS CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION

Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE; Comment: AGREED

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION-J FLOWERS HEALTH INSTITUTE-BILLING

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: J. FLOWERS HEALTH INSTITUTE - BILLING

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

ISSUE CITATION - 2. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ISSUE CITATION - 3. UBER, INC.

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ISSUE CITATION - 4. UBER USA, LLC

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ISSUE CITATION - 5. UBER WORKS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ISSUE CITATION - 6. UBER FREIGHT, LLC

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ISSUE CITATION - 7. UBER PAYMENTS, LLC

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ISSUE CITATION - 8. NEUTRON HOLDINGS INC. DBA LIME BIKE

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ISSUE CITATION - 9. TIARA TYREON HATTEN

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: HILL HEALS CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: J. FLOWERS HEALTH INSTITUTE - BILLING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE; Comment: AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CONTINUANCE; Comment: AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: RESTORE WELLNESS - BILLING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: ACUPUNCTURE MEDICAL SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: MEDICAL CLINIC OF HOUSTON - MEDICAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: KINETIK CHAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 10/22/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/26/2021: Comment; UBER WORKS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 10/22/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/26/2021: Comment; UBER USA, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 10/22/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 10/26/2021: Comment; UBER INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 10/22/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/26/2021: Comment; UBER TECHNOLOGIES,INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 10/22/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/26/2021: Comment; SOCIAL BICYCLES, LLC d/b/a JUMP BIKES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: PER ATTY ESERVE (DO NOT ISSUE ATTY PICKUP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Bicycles, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER WORKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER is a litigant