This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/24/2022 at 05:58:47 (UTC).

JULISE RIOS GARCIA, et al vs. PISHON TRUCKING, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 JULISE RIOS GARCIA, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PISHON TRUCKING, LLC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are USED, NOT, SMITH, CRAIG and WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9087

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

USED, NOT

SMITH, CRAIG

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA, JULISE RIOS

Christi, TX 78401

GARCIA, MAHANDRA

Christi, TX 78401

Defendants

PISHON TRUCKING, LLC

5800 Preston Oaks Road, Apt. 2071

Dallas, TX 75254

DEBEL, BEDILU MELKESA

Manor, TX 78653

AMERCIAN CAPITAL TRUCKING LLC

9550 Forest Ln Ste 458

Dallas, TX 75243

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOWAN, GREGORY

Defendant Attorney

LAIDLAW, DONALD

 

Court Documents

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Further Motions to Reinstate will be denied

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Further Motions to Reinstate will be denied

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Further Motions to Reinstate will be denied

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Further Motions to Reinstate will be denied

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Further Motions to Reinstate will be denied

ISSUE CITATION - BEDILU MELKESA DEBEL

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - PISHON TRUCKING LLC

ISSUE CITATION

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER FOR ISSUE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: Further Motions to Reinstate will be denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: - CROWN CHIROPRACTIC (BILLING) / EZEKIEL DAN HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: - CROWN CHIROPRACTIC (MEDICAL) / EZEKIEL DAN HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: - CROWN CHIROPRACTIC (MEDICAL) / JULISE RIOS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: - CROWN CHIROPRACTIC (BILLING) / MAJANDRA GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CROWN CHIROPRACTIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CROWN CHIROPRACTIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: AMERICAN CAPITAL TRUCKING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/15/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 09/16/2021: Comment; BEDILU MELKESA DEBEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/24/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 05/16/2022: Comment; PISHON TRUCKING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, JULISE RIOS : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 44937-2021-DCLK; GARCIA, JULISE RIOS $348.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, JULISE RIOS : Transaction Assessment; ; $348.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: GARCIA, JULISE RIOS ; Total Financial Assessment $371.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $371.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PISHON TRUCKING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAIDLAW, DONALD