This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/02/2022 at 17:02:25 (UTC).

JOEY G JONES vs. MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD, STANLEY R BEARD

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 JOEY G JONES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD, STANLEY R BEARD. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BELLAN, MELISSA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********52-B

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BELLAN, MELISSA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES, JOEY G

Dallas, TX 75251

Jones, Joey G.

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendants

MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BEARD, STANLEY R

Crockett, TX 75838

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STUCKY, RICHARD A.

Defendant Attorney

WRIGHT, MICHAEL CALVIN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 62716183

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 62716183

MARTEN TRANS-ROS.pdf

RETURN OF SERVICE

20020418 - Defendants Marten Transport, Ltd. 's Original Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 03/22/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, JOEY G : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, JOEY G : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-02259; JONES, JOEY G $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, JOEY G : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: JONES, JOEY G ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 62716183

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTEN TRANSPORT LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT, MICHAEL CALVIN