This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 19:04:15 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC vs. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WYSOCKI, ASHLEY and PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4902

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC

Defendant

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

1999 Bryan St., Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER, CARL L

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE NOTICE - LAVETTE L DUDLEY AKA LAVETTE LIPSCOMB DUDLEY

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE AMENDED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE AMENDED NOTICE - LAVETTE L DUDLEY AKA LAVETTE LIPSCOMB DUDLEY

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - JP MORGAN CASE BANK, NA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - JP MORGAN CASE BANK, NA

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - JP MORGAN CASE BANK, NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: LAVETTE L DUDLEY AKA LAVETTE LIPSCOMB DUDLEY - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Served: 06/14/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 1: Returned; 06/16/2022: Comment; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: LAVETTE L DUDLEY AKA LAVETTE LIPSCOMB DUDLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 28567-2022-DCLK; INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER, CARL L