This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 17:58:28 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC vs. FRANCIS OLAITAN

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCIS OLAITAN. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8333

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

4733, El Dorado

Hills, CA 95762

Defendants

OLAITAN, FRANCIS

Garland, TX 75040

OLAITAN, FRANCIS O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER, CARL L

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION - FRANCIS OLAITAN

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - FRANCIS OLAITAN

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - FRANCIS OLAITAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - FRANCIS OLAITAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/24/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 03/25/2022: Comment; FRANCIS OLAITAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 84840-2021-DCLK; INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC ; Total Financial Assessment $314.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER, CARL L