This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/25/2022 at 01:09:43 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. vs. FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WYSOCKI, ASHLEY and TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7845

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC.

Defendant

FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS

507 N Gray St

Killeen, TX 76541

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER, CARL L

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF WRIT OF GARNIS

AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: NOTICE

PROPOSED ORDER NONSUIT AS TO GARNISHEE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: NON-SUIT AS TO GARNISHEE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT AGAINST GARNISHEE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: AGAINST GARNISHEE

EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - FIRST NATIONAL BANK

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - FIRST NATIONAL BANK

PROPOSED ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

PROPOSED ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

134th DWOP-Rule165a/Mondays Setting

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

Cover Sheet (General)

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER GARNISHMENT TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

Cover Sheet (General)

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER GARNISHMENT TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION w/ORDER-WRIT/GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF TEXAS

ISSUE WRIT

ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; TILLERY, DALE; Judgment Type; ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC.; Awarded Against:; FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT OF WRIT OF GARNIS

AFFIDAVIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: NON-SUIT AS TO GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: AGAINST GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - FIRST NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Served: 04/22/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 04/26/2022: Comment; FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC.: Awarded Against:; FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER GARNISHMENT TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 82849-2021-DCLK; INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ORDER FOR ISSUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First National Bank Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER, CARL L