This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 00:41:44 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. vs. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, N A. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are REDMOND, AIESHA and WYSOCKI, ASHLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5087

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

REDMOND, AIESHA

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC.

Defendant

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

1999 Bryan St., Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER, CARL L

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE NOTICE - ASHLEY D WINSTON AKA ASHLEY DENESE WINSTON

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

160th Dismissal

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: CASE FILED 5-16-22; DEF UNSERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: REDMOND, AIESHA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: CASE FILED 5-16-22; DEF UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: ASHLEY D WINSTON AKA ASHLEY DENESE WINSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 29362-2022-DCLK; INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER, CARL L