This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 01:16:51 (UTC).

IN RE WENDLAND WELL CASES LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 IN RE WENDLAND WELL CASES LITIGATION was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILANOVICH, LINDA

Beddingfield, Erika

Balboa, Omar

Cabrera, Joe Eric

Carrillo, Miguel

Mirelez, Kevin Lee

Maldonado, Norma

Hendrix, Traci

Hendrix, Madison

Defendants

CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LTD.

CC FORBES, LLC

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LLC

A&L HOT OIL SERVICE, INC.

SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC

WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEHL, RYAN H.

DAO, ANDREW

BLACK, JOHN SCOTT

DALY, RICHARD D

ITKIN, JASON A.

PARKER, J C

MILLER, MICHAEL SIDNEY

DESOUZA, JASON F.

ALVAREZ, OMAR G.

LYONS, MICHAEL P

Defendant Attorneys

NORRIS, JOSHUA A

CILFONE, CHARLES J

ZITO, NICHOLAS E

DOHERTY, BRENDAN P

FIELDS, CHARLOTTE A

Other Attorneys

BALIDO, CARLOS A

NEGEM, JIMMY MICHAEL

MCFARLAND, DAVID A

 

Court Documents

AMENDED SUBPEONA-DEBRA A KULCHYCHI

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED SUBPEONA-DEBRA A KULCHYCHI

PLAINTIFF 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO OF DEBRA A KULCHYCHI

DISCOVERY; Comment: PLAINTIFF 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO OF DEBRA A KULCHYCKI

AMENDED SUBPOENA-DR. NOMEEN AZEEM

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED SUBPOENA- DR. NOMEEN AZEEM

PLAINTIFF 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO OF DR. AZEEN

DISCOVERY; Comment: PLAINTIFF 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO OF DR. AZEEN

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DEFENDANT(OTIS) NO EVID MSJ

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: DEFENDANT (OTIS) NO EVID MSJ

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: (SDS) NO EVID & TRAD MSJ

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: (SDS) NO EVID & TRAD MSJ

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING (CHEASPEAKE) MTN ENFORCE SUBPEONA D/T (HUMPAL)

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: proposed Order - Motion to Enforce

MOTION FEES AND COSTS/CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: FEES AND COSTS

2022-09-02 Motion to Enforce_Redacted.pdf

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: COLLC's Motion to Enforce Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued to Humpal

SDS MTN SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - MIRELEZ

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - MIRELEZ

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - MALDONADO

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - MALDONADO

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - T. HENDRIX

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - T. HENDRIX

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - M. HENDRIX

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - M. HENDRIX

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - CARRILLO

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - CARRILLO

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - CABRERA

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - CABRERA

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - BALBOA

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - BALBOA

891 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2024
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: JUDGE JIM JORDAN ASSIGNED TO HEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Summary Judgment; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: SDS M/S/J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED SUBPEONA-DEBRA A KULCHYCHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: PLAINTIFF 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO OF DEBRA A KULCHYCKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED SUBPOENA- DR. NOMEEN AZEEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: PLAINTIFF 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO OF DR. AZEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: M/ENFORCE JUDGE JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: KENT SABATOSE DC, DIBCN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - COMPEL; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
638 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION ; Total Financial Assessment $292.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - MIRELEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - T. HENDRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - M. HENDRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - CARRILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - CABRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PRETRIAL COURT - BALBOA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CC FORBES, LLC is a litigant