This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 20:06:05 (UTC).

IN RE: JAMES DONDERO

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 IN RE JAMES DONDERO was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9534

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONDERO, JAMES

Defendants

ALVAREZ & MARSAL CRF MANAGEMENT, LLC

2100 Ross Ave 21St Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

FARALLON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC

2100, San

Francisco, CA 94111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SBAITI, MAZIN A

Defendant Attorneys

ROSENTHAL, MICHAEL ALAN

COX, JOHN T III

MCILWAIN, BRENT

SCHULTE, DAVID C

 

Court Documents

ISSUE CITATION - FARALLON CAPITAL MGMT. LLC

ISSUE CITATION

NOTICE OF REMOVAL

TO FEDERAL COURT; NOTICE OF REMOVAL

ISSUE CITATION - ALVAREZ & MARSAL CRF MGMT., LLC

ISSUE CITATION

VERIFIED PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BEFORE SUIT AND SEEK DOCUMENTS

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: VERIFIED PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BEFORE SUIT AND SEEK DOCUMENTS

MAILED ORDER DISMISS TO DAVID SCHULTE

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

MAILED ORDER DISMISS TO MICHAEL ROSENTHAL

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

MAILED ORDER DISMISS TO MAZIN SBAITI

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT

DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT

ORDER - DENY

ORDER - DENY

DEF/ OBJECTION TO SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

OBJECTION; Comment: DEF/OBJECTION TO SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

PLTF/2ND NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PETITIONER'S SECOND NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

PROPOSED ORDER ON AMENDED PETITION

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON AMENDED PETITION

PLTF/NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

1ST AMENDED ANSWER

AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: 1ST

FARALLON CAPITAL ADOPTION OF AND JOINDER IN ALVAREZ & MARSAL RESPONSE TO DONDERO'S PETITION

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ADOPTION OF AND JOINDER IN ALVAREZ & MARSAL RESPONSE TO DONDERO'S PETITION

1ST AMENDED ANSWER

AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: 1ST

PROPOSED ORDER DENYING AMENDED PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER DENYING AMENDED PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 202 case - Suit filed July, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; ALVAREZ & MARSAL CRF MANAGEMENT, LLC, et al: Awarded Against:; DONDERO, JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DENY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Comment: DEF/OBJECTION TO SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 09:45 AM; Comment: KIM 214-432-2899, ZOOM CC REC 5/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: PETITIONER'S SECOND NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON AMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; ALVAREZ & MARSAL CRF MANAGEMENT, LLC, et al: Awarded Against:; DONDERO, JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTO FEDERAL COURT; NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: ALVAREZ & MARSAL CRF MANAGEMENT, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: FARALLON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for DONDERO, JAMES : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 47514-2021-DCLK; DONDERO, JAMES $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for DONDERO, JAMES : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: DONDERO, JAMES ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: VERIFIED PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BEFORE SUIT AND SEEK DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALVAREZ & MARSAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FARALLON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COX, JOHN T III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C Schulte