This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/23/2023 at 03:15:33 (UTC).

IHEARTMEDIA INC vs. ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 IHEARTMEDIA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1373

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IHEARTMEDIA INC

Defendant

ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALLI, LAWRENCE J.

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO RETAIN

2ND VERIFIED MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN; Comment: 2ND VERIFIED

PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO RETAIN

MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

DEFAULT JUDGEMENT MAILED

DEFAULT JUDGEMENT MAILED

E-SERVE COVER LETTER

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVE COVER LETTER - ESERVE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

E-SERVE DEFAULT JUDGEMENT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVE COVER LETTER - ESERVE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PLTF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PROPOSED ORDER MOTION TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type; DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; IHEARTMEDIA INC; Awarded Against:; ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

dwop hearing notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Suit filed 1/30/23. Def. served ___.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DWOP

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON DWOP

RE: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC CERTIFICATE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC CERTIFICATE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: Suit filed 1/30/23. Def. served ___.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVE COVER LETTER - ESERVE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; IHEARTMEDIA INC: Awarded Against:; ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON DWOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: Dismissal re-set to 10/6/2023. Notice E-Served. Env. #79464262

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for IHEARTMEDIA INC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for IHEARTMEDIA INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 6464-2023-DCLK; IHEARTMEDIA INC $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for IHEARTMEDIA INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: IHEARTMEDIA INC ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less