This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/23/2023 at 03:15:33 (UTC).

IHEARTMEDIA INC vs. ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 IHEARTMEDIA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1373

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IHEARTMEDIA INC

Defendant

ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALLI, LAWRENCE J.

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO RETAIN

2ND VERIFIED MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN; Comment: 2ND VERIFIED

PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO RETAIN

MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

DEFAULT JUDGEMENT MAILED

DEFAULT JUDGEMENT MAILED

E-SERVE COVER LETTER

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVE COVER LETTER - ESERVE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

E-SERVE DEFAULT JUDGEMENT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVE COVER LETTER - ESERVE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PLTF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PROPOSED ORDER MOTION TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type; DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; IHEARTMEDIA INC; Awarded Against:; ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

dwop hearing notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Suit filed 1/30/23. Def. served ___.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DWOP

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON DWOP

RE: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC CERTIFICATE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC CERTIFICATE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: Suit filed 1/30/23. Def. served ___.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: ESERVE COVER LETTER - ESERVE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; IHEARTMEDIA INC: Awarded Against:; ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - RETAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON DWOP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: Dismissal re-set to 10/6/2023. Notice E-Served. Env. #79464262

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO RETAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - RETAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: ROU REALTY GROUP, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

FinancialFinancial info for IHEARTMEDIA INC : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

FinancialFinancial info for IHEARTMEDIA INC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 6464-2023-DCLK; IHEARTMEDIA INC $221.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

FinancialFinancial info for IHEARTMEDIA INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

FinancialFinancial: IHEARTMEDIA INC ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less