This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/25/2022 at 08:15:24 (UTC).

HILDA FLORES vs. CORNERSTONE HOME LENDING, INC. , et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 HILDA FLORES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CORNERSTONE HOME LENDING, INC . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5950

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES, HILDA

Defendants

CORNERSTONE HOME LENDING, INC.

C/O Marc N Laird, 1177 West Loop South Ste 700

Houston, TX 77027

CENLAR FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

C/O Texas Secretary Of State, Citations Unit James E Rudder Bldg

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELSTOWSKI, JOHN G

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT/ RELEASE BOND

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; FLORES, HILDA; Awarded Against:; CORNERSTONE HOME LENDING, INC., et al

AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

AGREED NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

RULE 11 AGREEMENT

RULE 11; Comment: AGREEMENT

ORDER - EXTEND TRO

ORDER - EXTEND TRO; Comment: AND RESCHEDULING TEMP INJ HEARING

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

TRUST RECEIPT

TRUST RECEIPT

ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

AGREED NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

RULE 11 AGREEMENT

RULE 11; Comment: AGREEMENT

ORDER - EXTEND TRO

ORDER - EXTEND TRO; Comment: AND RESCHEDULING TEMP INJ HEARING

PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RESCHEDULING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RESCHEDULING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRUST RECEIPT; Comment: RELEASE OF CASH BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; FLORES, HILDA: Awarded Against:; CORNERSTONE HOME LENDING, INC., et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO RELEASE CASH BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Injunction; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: SET PER ORDER TO EXTEND TRO SIGNED 11-16-2021. HEARING TO BE CONDUCTED VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONVERENCE AND LIVESTREAMED ON YOUTUBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRULE 11; Comment: AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXTEND TRO; Comment: AND RESCHEDULING TEMP INJ HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Injunction; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: HEARING SET PER TRO SIGNED 11-2-2021. TO BE CONDUCTED VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE AND LIVESTREAMED ON YOUTUBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RESCHEDULING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketBOND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRO HEARING; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FLORES, HILDA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 72855-2021-DCLK; FLORES, HILDA $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FLORES, HILDA : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: FLORES, HILDA ; Total Financial Assessment $356.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $356.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE; Comment: PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Helstowski