This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 16:18:08 (UTC).

GUSTAVO ESPINOZA vs. CELESINO DIAZ DIAZ, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 GUSTAVO ESPINOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CELESINO DIAZ DIAZ. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1988

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOZA, GUSTAVO

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

NELSON TREE SERVICE, L.L.C.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

DIAZ, CELESINO DIAZ

Dallas, TX 75228

ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT, L.L.C.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAENISCH, STEPHANIE

RAMSEY, BRANDON

Defendant Attorneys

JORDAN-BROWN, MCKENZIE L.

GREENE, ADRAON D

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION - COMPEL

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER-AFFIDAVITS

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER-AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE OF HEARING 04/12/22 8:30 MOTION COMPEL

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: 04/12/22 8:30 MOTION COMPEL

PROPOSED ORDER TO COMPEL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO COMPEL

PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER AGREED FOR CONTINUANCE

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

MOTION - CONTINUANCE

Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: AT&T MOBILITY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION- MEMENTUM SPINE AND JOINT - RADIOLOGY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: MOMENTUM SPINE AND JOINT - RADIOLOGY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - MEDICAL CITY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: MEDICAL CITY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: PERSONNEL PAYROLL RECORDS - DART-DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT - GUSTAVO ESPINOZA, JR.

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: BILLING RECORDS - MOMENTUM SPINE AND JOINT - GUSTAVO ESPINOZA, JR.

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: PRESCRIPTION RECORDS AND BILLS - MEMORIAL CARE PHARMACY - GUSTAVO ESPINOZA, JR.

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: AT&T MOBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: MOMENTUM SPINE AND JOINT - RADIOLOGY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: MEDICAL CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: PERSONNEL PAYROLL RECORDS - DART-DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT - GUSTAVO ESPINOZA, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/04/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 03/05/2021: Comment; CELESTINO DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/26/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 02/26/2021: Comment; ASPLUNDH TREE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Served: 02/25/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 02/26/2021: Comment; NELSON TREE SERVICE L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESPINOZA, GUSTAVO : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 9595-2021-DCLK; ESPINOZA, GUSTAVO $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESPINOZA, GUSTAVO : Transaction Assessment; ; $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: ESPINOZA, GUSTAVO ; Total Financial Assessment $316.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NELSON TREE SERVICE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENE, ADRAON DELJOHN