This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/13/2023 at 20:45:16 (UTC).

GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY vs. HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6183

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY

11940 Jollyville Rd., Ste. 215N

Austin, TX 78759

Defendants

HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

5420 Lyndon B. Johnson Frwy, Ste. 1100

Dallas, TX 75240

HALLMARK COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLOMON, MARK A

Defendant Attorney

Boepple, Rick

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER-HALLMARK

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 12/15/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 12/20/2022: Comment; HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. D/B/A HALLMARK COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 75876-2022-DCLK; GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 73887-2022-DCLK; GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY $213.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hallmark County Mutual Ins. Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLOMON, MARK ANDREW