This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 22:15:07 (UTC).

GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT et al vs. UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1371

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GARLAND

Defendants

UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC

2917 Mountview Pl

Plano, TX 75023

KING CLASSIC, LLC

2917 Mountview Pl

Plano, TX 75023

T BANK, NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

COVER LETTER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 3

CIT - T BANK

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - UNITED TRIANGLE

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - KING CLASSIC

ISSUE CITATION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

T BANK, NA EXEC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - T BANK NA

MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS

PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et al; Awarded Against:; UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 64017-2022-DCLK; PERFUD $614.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et al: Awarded Against:; UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - T BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 09/20/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 3; Anticipated Method: Comment; 3-CIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: UNITED TRIANGLE, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $454.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $614.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATIONS 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KING CLASSIC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where T Bank, National Association is a litigant